|
05/26/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 16. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 26, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 18. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 18, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 11, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|