04/12/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/08/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 12, 2010. | |||
04/06/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/05/2010 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/18/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled. |