05/19/2010 | Becomes HB 1486. | |||
05/18/2010 | Reported by substitute (12-0) (Regular) | |||
05/11/2010 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |||
05/11/2010 | Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/18/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled. |