Louisiana 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR156

Introduced
5/10/10  
Engrossed
5/10/10  

Caption

Recognizes May 11, 2010, as La. Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Capitol

Impact

By officially recognizing this day, the resolution aims to highlight the important role that licensed professional surveyors play in Louisiana. This acknowledgment serves not only to honor the history and achievements of the Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors but also to elevate the profession’s status within the state. Such recognition can help promote awareness of the profession among the public and other sectors of industry that rely on surveying services.

Summary

House Concurrent Resolution HCR156 recognizes May 11, 2010, as 'Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day' at the Louisiana State Capitol. The resolution commends the society for its significant contributions to the practice of surveying since the licensing of professional surveyors began in 1908. It emphasizes the high standards of integrity maintained by licensed surveyors and their commitment to safeguarding life, health, and property while promoting public welfare through their professional conduct.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding this resolution is overwhelmingly positive, reflecting a collective appreciation for the work and dedication of professional surveyors. Legislators from both houses express commendation for the society's unwavering commitment to excellence and the technological advancements in the field. This recognition fosters a sense of pride among surveyors and reinforces the importance of their contributions to the state's development.

Contention

As a concurrent resolution, HCR156 possesses a unifying intent rather than creating or amending laws. It does not seem to evoke contention as it purely serves a ceremonial purpose. However, the recognition of professional standards can inadvertently bring attention to ongoing discussions around the importance of licensing and regulatory oversight within various professional fields, including surveying. It serves as a reminder of the standards that licensed professionals are expected to uphold.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR15

Commends the Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors and recognizes March 18, 2014, as "Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day" at the State Capitol.

LA SR100

Recognizes May 5, 2016, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR50

Recognizes April 27, 2017, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR26

Recognizes Tuesday, May 3, 2011, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR71

Designates Tuesday, May 11, 2010, as "Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day" at the legislature.

LA HCR36

Designates April 25, 2019, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR22

Recognizes Tuesday, May 3, 2011, as La. Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the state capitol

LA HCR263

Urges and requests the La. Professional Engineering and Land Surveying Board to suspend charging fees from professional engineers and professional land surveyors who have been classified as retired