06/18/2010 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/15/2010 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/14/2010 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/11/2010 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
06/10/2010 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
06/10/2010 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 87, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/09/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2010. | |||
06/09/2010 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/09/2010 | Discharged from the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
05/24/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |