Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
06/14/2010
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
06/11/2010
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010.
06/11/2010
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
06/10/2010
Reported favorably (9-0-1).
05/27/2010
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.