|
06/02/2010
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-1).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|