05/11/2010 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 5/11/2010. | |||
05/11/2010 | Approved on 5/11/2010. | |||
05/03/2010 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/3/10. | |||
04/29/2010 | Request study by the committee on Insurance. | |||
04/29/2010 | Received by the Senate Office on 4/29/10. | |||
04/29/2010 | Sent to the Senate. | |||
04/26/2010 | Study request list distributed to members on April 26. | |||
04/20/2010 | Received on April 13. |