LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR152
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR152
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR152
Action History
06/20/2010
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010.
06/17/2010
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
06/16/2010
Reported with amendments (11-0).
06/09/2010
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.