|
06/09/2010
|
Effective date 6/9/10.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 159.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 26, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Reported favorably (8-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|