|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice Senate recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; recommitted to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of change in House Conference Committee membership.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House Conference Committee membership changed: Connick vice Brossett.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Gallot, Brossett, and Ligi.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Senate Conference Committee membership changed: Amedee vice Claitor.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Gautreaux, N., Kostelka, and Claitor.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|