|
06/30/2010
|
Effective date 6/30/10.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 795.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|