LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB629
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB629
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB629
Action History
04/22/2010
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
04/21/2010
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
04/21/2010
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
04/20/2010
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
04/19/2010
Reported favorably.
03/29/2010
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources.
03/19/2010
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Natural Resources.