LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB688
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB688
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB688
Action History
05/24/2010
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
05/20/2010
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
05/19/2010
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
05/18/2010
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
05/17/2010
Reported with amendments.
04/06/2010
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education.