06/03/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
06/02/2010 | Reported favorably (12-0-1) (Regular). | |||
05/24/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
05/20/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
05/19/2010 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/18/2010 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/17/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
04/19/2010 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |