|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice Senate reconsidered and recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; recommitted to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Leger, Hutter, and Arnold.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Murray, and Duplessis.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|