Louisiana 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR112

Introduced
6/8/10  
Passed
6/8/10  

Caption

Commends La Musique de Louisianne Inc., (The Louisiana Music Hall of Fame) and declares it the official honors and recognition organization and information resource for Louisiana's music, musicians, and musical heritage.

Impact

While SCR112 does not enact changes to state laws, it highlights the pivotal role that music plays in Louisiana's economy. The resolution underscores the multibillion dollar music industry and its associated sectors, such as advertising, entertainment, and tourism. By designating La Musique de Louisianne Inc. as the official organization for the state’s musical heritage, the resolution aims to foster community pride and investment in local music initiatives, thereby enhancing the economic well-being of Louisiana citizens and the overall music industry within the state.

Summary

SCR112 is a resolution that commends La Musique de Louisianne Inc., recognizing it as the official honors and recognition organization for Louisiana's music, musicians, and musical heritage. The bill emphasizes the importance of Louisiana's rich musical cultures and acknowledges the contributions of local musicians and songwriters in the evolution of various musical genres. La Musique de Louisianne Inc. plays a vital role in promoting, preserving, and educating the public about the state's musical legacy, which has a significant influence on the music industry both nationally and internationally.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR112 appears to be overwhelmingly positive, as it recognizes the contributions of a nonprofit organization dedicated to preserving Louisiana's rich musical heritage. Supporters appreciate the resolution as a means to uplift and celebrate local culture. The designation of La Musique de Louisianne Inc. not only honors its past efforts but also encourages further developments and recognition of musical talent within the state. The resolution seems to resonate with community members and legislators alike, fostering a sense of unity and pride in Louisiana's unique musical identity.

Contention

There are no apparent notable points of contention regarding SCR112, as it focuses on honoring La Musique de Louisianne Inc. and its contributions. The resolution is likely to receive broad support from various stakeholders in the music industry, as it does not propose any regulatory changes or financial implications. The resolution mainly serves as a celebration of Louisiana's music and cultural heritage, providing a platform for further awareness and appreciation of the state's musical landscape without inciting any significant debate.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR12

Recognizes Tuesday, March 19, 2024, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA HB330

Creates the Industrial Hemp Promotion and Research Program (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

LA HB531

Provides for the Louisiana Department of Economic Development to establish and administer the Louisiana Industrial Product Certification Program (RE +$202,029 SG EX See Note)

LA SR67

Declares May 5, 2010, as "Louisiana Chemical Industry Day" in Louisiana.

LA HR86

Recognizes May 7, 2013, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day

LA HR37

Designates March 19, 2024, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day at the state capitol

LA SR75

To designate May 9, 2023, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day.

LA SR83

Designates May 9, 2017, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day.