06/07/2010 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
05/20/2010 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/20/2010 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/19/2010 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/19/2010 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
05/18/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/17/2010 | Senate amendments were read and adopted. Read by title as amended and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
05/12/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/30/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. |