05/10/2010 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06. | |||
05/03/2010 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
04/28/2010 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
04/27/2010 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
04/26/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
04/21/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/29/2010 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |