05/25/2010 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | |||
05/25/2010 | Approved on 5/25/2010. | |||
05/18/2010 | Study request list distributed to members on May 18. | |||
05/12/2010 | Received on May 12. | |||
05/11/2010 | Sent to the House. | |||
04/29/2010 | Study request list distributed to the members on 4/29/10. | |||
04/28/2010 | Request study by the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |||
04/28/2010 | Received by the Senate Office on 4/28/10. |