|
06/24/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 159.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/11/2011.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|