|
06/20/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 107.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|