|
06/24/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 206.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 252 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (14-0).
|
|
|