06/27/2011 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/23/2011 | Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |||
06/22/2011 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/21/2011 | Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in. | |||
06/20/2011 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011. | |||
06/19/2011 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2011. | |||
06/16/2011 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/19/2011. | |||
06/15/2011 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |||
06/15/2011 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
06/13/2011 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
06/09/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |