06/14/2011 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/13/2011 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/09/2011 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/09/2011 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
06/08/2011 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
06/06/2011 | Reported favorably. | |||
05/02/2011 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |||
04/27/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |