Louisiana 2011 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR42

Introduced
5/23/11  

Caption

Recognizes May 24, 2011, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the La. Dental Hygienists' Association and dental hygienists around the state

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR113

Commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association and dental hygienists around the state for their outstanding contributions to the oral health of citizens of the state and recognizes Tuesday, May 15, 2012, as Dental Hygiene Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA HR115

Recognizes May 25, 2010, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the La. Dental Hygienists' Association and dental hygienists around the state

LA SR78

Recognizes Tuesday, April 10, 2018, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association on celebrating 105 years of Dental Hygienists Profession.

LA SR85

Recognizes Tuesday, May 7, 2013, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association.

LA SR60

Recognizes May 24, 2011, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association and dental hygienists around the state for their outstanding contributions to the oral health of citizens of the state of Louisiana.

LA SR88

Recognizes Wednesday, April 30, 2014, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association.

LA HR90

Recognizes Tuesday, May 15, 2012, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Dental Hygienists' Association for their outstanding contributions throughout the state

LA HR100

Recognizes Wednesday, April 30, 2014, as La. Dental Hygienists' Association Day at the state capitol, commends the association, and celebrates 101 years of the dental hygiene profession