Recognizes May 24, 2011, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the La. Dental Hygienists' Association and dental hygienists around the state
Recognizes May 25, 2010, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the La. Dental Hygienists' Association and dental hygienists around the state
Commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association and dental hygienists around the state for their outstanding contributions to the oral health of citizens of the state and recognizes Tuesday, May 15, 2012, as Dental Hygiene Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Recognizes Tuesday, April 10, 2018, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association on celebrating 105 years of Dental Hygienists Profession.
Recognizes Tuesday, May 7, 2013, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association.
Recognizes May 24, 2011, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association and dental hygienists around the state for their outstanding contributions to the oral health of citizens of the state of Louisiana.
Recognizes Wednesday, April 30, 2014, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Louisiana Dental Hygienists' Association.
Recognizes Tuesday, May 15, 2012, as Dental Hygiene Day and commends the Dental Hygienists' Association for their outstanding contributions throughout the state