|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate reconsideration and adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate rejecting Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice House rejected the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 15 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
By a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 78, nays 16. The Conference Committee Report was rejected.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 15 yeas and 18 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
House conferees appointed: Greene, Carmody, and Sam Jones.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Marionneaux, McPherson, and Broome.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|