06/13/2011 | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 271. | |||
06/13/2011 | Rules suspended | |||
06/13/2011 | Reported by substitute. | |||
06/01/2011 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |||
05/25/2011 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported with amendments. | |||
04/25/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary B. | |||
04/15/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary B. |