|
06/24/2011
|
Effective date 6/24/11.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 157.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 229. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|