06/16/2011 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
06/15/2011 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |||
06/15/2011 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 10 yeas and 21 nays. | |||
06/15/2011 | Called from the calendar. | |||
06/08/2011 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
06/08/2011 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. | |||
06/06/2011 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
06/01/2011 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/31/2011 | Reported favorably. | |||
04/25/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Environmental Quality. | |||
04/14/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Environmental Quality. |