Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20.
05/17/2011
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
05/12/2011
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
05/11/2011
Received from the House without amendments.
05/11/2011
Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
05/10/2011
Received in the House from the Senate.
05/09/2011
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.