04/25/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |||
04/24/2012 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
04/24/2012 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/18/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2012. | |||
04/16/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/12/2012 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |||
04/03/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |||
04/02/2012 | Read by title. |