|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/9/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Reported favorably (15-0-1) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|