|
04/09/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/3/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|