|
05/25/2012
|
Effective date: May 25, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 256.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/21/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/26/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported favorably (14-0-1) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|