|
05/23/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/3/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|