05/21/2012 | Notice removed. | |||
05/15/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012. | |||
05/15/2012 | Notice given. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/09/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012. | |||
05/09/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/08/2012 | Reported with amendments (20-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
03/02/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |||
03/02/2012 | Prefiled. |