|
06/08/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 8, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 68, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 15 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
By a vote of 20 yeas and 13 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 18 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 44. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/10/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments (13-3) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|