|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/5/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|