|
06/15/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 15, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 71, nays 4. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 9 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Broome, White, and Dorsey-Colomb.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Barrow, Girod Jackson, and Ponti.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported with amendments (14-0-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|