|
05/11/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 110.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/4/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|