06/06/2012 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/04/2012 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/03/2012 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/01/2012 | Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in. | |||
05/31/2012 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012. | |||
05/31/2012 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |||
05/31/2012 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
05/30/2012 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |