|
05/24/2012
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/21/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|