05/22/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
05/21/2012 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/21/2012 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 73, nays 13. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/16/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012. | |||
05/09/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/08/2012 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | |||
03/29/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/28/2012 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |