|
06/01/2012
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments (7-0).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|