|
06/11/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 731.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2012.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Brossett, Arnold, and Garofalo.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Morrell, and Peterson.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|