|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 15, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/06.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 64, nays 12. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Brossett, Girod Jackson, and Leger.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Tarver, and Heitmeier.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 7. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|