|
06/07/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 649.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 50, nays 27. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Reported with amendments (15-2) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|