LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB648
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB648
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB648
Action History
04/23/2012
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
04/19/2012
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
04/18/2012
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
04/17/2012
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
04/16/2012
Reported favorably.
04/03/2012
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
04/02/2012
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.